AR HB1109 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Notification that HB1109 is now Act 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Notification that HB1109 is now Act 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Specific Alcoholic Beverage Control Division Permits Related To Restaurants; To Declare An Emergency And Make Technical Corrections.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Specific Alcoholic Beverage Control Division Permits Related To Restaurants; To Declare An Emergency And Make Technical Corrections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 84 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 84 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | House | Notification that HB1109 is now Act 1100 |
2013-04-09 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-08 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-08 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-02-18 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-02-18 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-02-14 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-02-14 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-02-14 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-02-13 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2013-01-23 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2013-01-22 | House | Filed |