AR HB1103 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Create The Universal Newborn Home Nurse Visitation Program To Provide Home Visitation Services For A Newborn Infant And The Parents Of A Newborn Infant.
Title
To Create The Universal Newborn Home Nurse Visitation Program To Provide Home Visitation Services For A Newborn Infant And The Parents Of A Newborn Infant.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment |
2023-02-27 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-02-27 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-01-31 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-01-31 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-01-31 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-01-10 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2023-01-10 | House | Filed |