AR HB1101 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Amount Of Signatures Required To Petition A School District Board Of Directors To Meet.
Title
To Amend The Amount Of Signatures Required To Petition A School District Board Of Directors To Meet.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-03 - House - Third Reading (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - Third Reading (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Senate | Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | The vote by which HB1101 Failed to Pass was expunged. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Motino to Expunge the vote by which HB1101 failed to pass. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-02-03 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-02-02 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-02-01 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-02-01 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-01 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-01-27 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-01-27 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-01-27 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-01-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-01-08 | House | Filed |