AR HB1101 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]

Summary

To Prohibit The University Of Arkansas For Medical Sciences From Receiving Medicaid Cost-settlement Reimbursement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Prohibit The University Of Arkansas For Medical Sciences From Receiving Medicaid Cost-settlement Reimbursement.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-18HouseRecommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-02-18HouseWITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
2019-02-13HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-13HouseAmendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-02-13HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-01-31HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-01-31HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-01-31HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-01-16HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-01-16HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-01-16HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-01-14HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-01-03HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback