AR HB1096 | 2020 | 92nd General Assembly Fiscal

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-20 - Notification that HB1096 is now Act 186
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Revenue Stabilization Law; To Create Funds, To Repeal Funds, And To Make Transfers To And From Funds And Fund Accounts; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Revenue Stabilization Law; To Create Funds, To Repeal Funds, And To Make Transfers To And From Funds And Fund Accounts; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-20HouseNotification that HB1096 is now Act 186
2020-04-16HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2020-04-16HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2020-04-16HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2020-04-16SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2020-04-16SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2020-04-16SenateRead the third time and passed.
2020-04-15SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2020-04-15SenateReceived from the House.
2020-04-15HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2020-04-15HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2020-04-15HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2020-04-15HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2020-04-15HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2020-04-15HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2020-04-15HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2020-04-15HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2020-04-08HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2020-04-06HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback