AR HB1090 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-08 - Notification that HB1090 is now Act 142
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-08 - Notification that HB1090 is now Act 142
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Arkansas Waterways Commission Appropriation For The 2017-2018 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The Arkansas Waterways Commission Appropriation For The 2017-2018 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Notification that HB1090 is now Act 142 |
2017-02-07 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-02-06 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-02-06 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Returned to the House as Passed. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-02-02 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-02-02 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-02-01 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-01 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-01 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-01-26 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2017-01-09 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2017-01-04 | House | Filed |