AR HB1090 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-13 - Notification that HB1090 is now Act 64
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Office Of The Treasurer Of State - General Obligation Bonds Appropriation For The 2015-2016 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Office Of The Treasurer Of State - General Obligation Bonds Appropriation For The 2015-2016 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-12 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-13HouseNotification that HB1090 is now Act 64
2015-02-12HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2015-02-12HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2015-02-12HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2015-02-12SenateReturned to the House as Passed.
2015-02-12SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2015-02-12SenateRead the third time and passed.
2015-02-11SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2015-02-11SenateReceived from the House.
2015-02-11HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2015-02-11HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2015-02-11HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2015-02-11HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2015-02-10HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2015-01-20HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2015-01-20HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback