AR HB1086 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning Parking Privileges For A Person Issued A Disabled Veteran Special License Plate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning Parking Privileges For A Person Issued A Disabled Veteran Special License Plate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-01-18 - House - Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-01SenateDied in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
2023-01-18SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
2023-01-18SenateReceived from the House.
2023-01-18HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-01-17HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2023-01-09HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
2023-01-06HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback