AR HB1086 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-06 - Notification that HB1086 is now Act 27
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Change The Qualifications For Special Needs Local School District Isolated Funding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Change The Qualifications For Special Needs Local School District Isolated Funding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-05 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-06HouseNotification that HB1086 is now Act 27
2015-02-05HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2015-02-05HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2015-02-05HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2015-02-05SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2015-02-05SenateRead the third time and passed.
2015-02-04SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2015-02-02SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
2015-01-29SenateReceived from the House.
2015-01-29HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2015-01-27HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2015-01-20HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2015-01-20HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback