AR HB1070 | 2020 | 92nd General Assembly Fiscal

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - Notification that HB1070 is now Act 65
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The State Department For Social Security Administration Disability Determination Appropriation For The 2020-2021 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The State Department For Social Security Administration Disability Determination Appropriation For The 2020-2021 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-17HouseNotification that HB1070 is now Act 65
2020-04-16HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2020-04-16HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2020-04-16SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2020-04-16SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2020-04-16SenateRead the third time and passed.
2020-04-15SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2020-04-15SenateReceived from the House.
2020-04-15HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2020-04-15HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2020-04-15HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2020-04-15HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2020-04-08HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2020-04-08HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2020-04-02HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback