AR HB1067 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Notification that HB1067 is now Act 225
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Notification that HB1067 is now Act 225
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Create The Arkansas Breast Milk Bank; And To Create The Breast Milk Bank Special Fund.
Title
To Create The Arkansas Breast Milk Bank; And To Create The Breast Milk Bank Special Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | House | Notification that HB1067 is now Act 225 |
2021-02-26 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-02-25 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-02-25 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-02-10 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-02-09 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-01-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2020-12-31 | House | Filed |