AR HB1063 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Notification that HB1063 is now Act 829
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Notification that HB1063 is now Act 829
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Telemedicine Act; To Authorize Additional Reimbursement For Telemedicine Via Telephone; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend The Telemedicine Act; To Authorize Additional Reimbursement For Telemedicine Via Telephone; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - Senate amendment # 4 read and concurred in. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - Senate amendment # 3 read and concurred in. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Emergency Clause failed of adoption. (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - Senate amendment # 3 read and concurred in. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Emergency Clause failed of adoption. (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | House | Notification that HB1063 is now Act 829 |
2021-04-20 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-19 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-19 | House | Senate amendment # 4 read and concurred in. |
2021-04-19 | House | Senate amendment # 3 read and concurred in. |
2021-04-19 | House | Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in. |
2021-04-19 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-04-19 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2021-04-15 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1, 2, 3, & 4 |
2021-04-13 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed as amended, Amendment #1, #2, #3, and #4 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Amendment # 4 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 4 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-06 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Motion to Expunge the Vote by which HB1063 passed. Motion passed. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Returned From the House as requested. |
2021-04-01 | House | Return to the Senate as requested |
2021-03-18 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-03-18 | House | Emergency Clause Having Failed of Adoption |
2021-03-18 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 and #2 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed as amended, Amendment #1 and #2; Emergency Clause having failed adoption. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Motion to expunge the vote by which the Emergency Clause failed of adoption failed. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Emergency Clause failed of adoption. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | The Emergency Clause was voted a 2nd time. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | The vote by which the Emergency Clause failed was expunged. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Emergency Clause failed of adoption. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-09 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-02-22 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-02-10 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-02-10 | House | Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-10 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-02-09 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 3 |
2021-02-08 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-02-08 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-08 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-01-25 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-01-25 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-01-25 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-01-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2020-12-31 | House | Filed |