AR HB1063 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-26 - House Notification that HB1063 is now Act 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-26 - House Notification that HB1063 is now Act 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
The General Appropriation Act For The Ordinary Expenses Of The Executive, Judicial And Legislative Branches For The 2011-2012 Fiscal Year.
Title
The General Appropriation Act For The Ordinary Expenses Of The Executive, Judicial And Legislative Branches For The 2011-2012 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-26 | House Notification that HB1063 is now Act 3 | |
2011-01-25 | House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | |
2011-01-25 | House TO BE ENROLLED | |
2011-01-25 | House Returned From the Senate as passed. | |
2011-01-25 | Senate Returned to the House as passed. | |
2011-01-25 | Senate EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-01-25 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-01-25 | Senate Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. | |
2011-01-24 | Senate Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. | |
2011-01-24 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-01-24 | House EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-01-24 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-01-20 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-01-20 | House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-01-20 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-01-20 | House EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-01-19 | House Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 | |
2011-01-13 | House Re-referred to the Committee on Joint Budget Committee | |
2011-01-12 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-01-10 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on Joint Budget Committee | |
2011-01-10 | House Filed |