AR HB1062 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-01 - Notification that HB1062 is now Act 77
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-01 - Notification that HB1062 is now Act 77
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The Issuance Of Process, Mandates, Or Subpoenas For Military Justice.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The Issuance Of Process, Mandates, Or Subpoenas For Military Justice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-31 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-01 | House | Notification that HB1062 is now Act 77 |
2017-01-31 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-01-31 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-01-31 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-01-23 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-01-18 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-01-09 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2016-12-29 | House | Filed |