AR HB1061 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Notification that HB1061 is now Act 311
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The No Patient Left Alone Act; Concerning Visitation Rights Of Patients; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The No Patient Left Alone Act; Concerning Visitation Rights Of Patients; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - Third Reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-10HouseNotification that HB1061 is now Act 311
2021-03-10HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2021-03-09HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2021-03-09HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2021-03-09SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2021-03-09SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2021-03-09SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-03-08SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-03-02SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-03-02SenateReceived from the House.
2021-03-02HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-03-01HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-01HouseAmendment No. 4 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-03-01HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-02-25HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 4
2021-02-24HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-02-24HouseAmendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-02-24HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-02-01HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-02-01HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-02-01HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-01-19HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-01-19HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-01-19HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-01-11HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2020-12-22HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=hb1061&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1061/HB1061122220201348.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1061/HB1061011920211005.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1061/HB1061020120211018.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1061/HB1061022420211127.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1061/HB1061030120211011.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2021R%2FPublic%2F&file=311.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/HB1061-H1.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/HB1061-H2.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/HB1061-H3.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/HB1061-H4.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1061&rcs=2167&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1061&rcs=2220&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R

Bill Comments

feedback