AR HB1055 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-10 - WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-10 - WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Summary
To Establish The Electric Cooperative Corporation Self-regulation Act Of 2021.
Title
To Establish The Electric Cooperative Corporation Self-regulation Act Of 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 30 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | House | WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR |
2021-03-02 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-02 | House | Amendment No. 4 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-02 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-02-09 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-02-09 | House | Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-09 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-02-01 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-02-01 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-01 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-01-25 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-01-25 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-01-25 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-01-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2020-12-21 | House | Filed |