AR HB1053 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning Mortgage Assignments And Mortgage Releases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning Mortgage Assignments And Mortgage Releases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-13 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 83 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-22HouseDied in Senate at Sine Die adjournment.
2015-04-22SenateSine Die adjournment
2015-04-22SenateDied in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
2015-02-17SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce
2015-02-17SenateReceived from the House.
2015-02-13HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2015-02-11HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2015-02-09HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2015-02-09HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2015-02-09HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2015-01-12HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2015-01-12HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback