AR HB1046 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-06 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Governing State Sales And Use Taxes Regarding Wheelchair-accessible Motor Vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Governing State Sales And Use Taxes Regarding Wheelchair-accessible Motor Vehicles.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-06HouseRecommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2023-04-06HouseWITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
2023-03-16HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-03-16HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-03-16HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-02-15HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-02-15HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-02-15HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-01-09HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2023-01-03HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback