AR HB1042 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - House Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - House Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Require The Department Of Finance And Administration To Publish A Monthly List Containing Sales And Use Tax Permit Numbers, Names, And Addresses For Each Taxpayer That Has Reported Tax For That Month.
Title
To Require The Department Of Finance And Administration To Publish A Monthly List Containing Sales And Use Tax Permit Numbers, Names, And Addresses For Each Taxpayer That Has Reported Tax For That Month.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Woods [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | House Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. | |
2011-01-20 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-01-20 | House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-01-20 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-01-10 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on House Committee on Revenue and Taxation | |
2010-12-02 | House Prefiled |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2011/2011R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB1042 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2011/2011R/Bills/HB1042.pdf |