AR HB1037 | 2014 | 89th General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-13 - Notification that HB1037 is now Act 273
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-13 - Notification that HB1037 is now Act 273
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Department Of Arkansas Heritage Appropriation For The 2014-2015 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The Department Of Arkansas Heritage Appropriation For The 2014-2015 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - The vote by which HB1037 failed to pass was not expunged. (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - The vote by which HB1037 failed to pass was not expunged. (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | Notification that HB1037 is now Act 273 |
2014-03-12 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2014-03-11 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2014-03-11 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Returned to the House as Passed. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2014-03-06 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2014-03-06 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2014-03-06 | House | The vote by which HB1037 failed to pass was expunged. |
2014-03-06 | House | The vote by which HB1037 failed to pass was not expunged. |
2014-03-06 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2014-03-06 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2014-03-05 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2014-02-18 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2014-02-13 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2014-02-10 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2014-02-05 | House | Filed |