AR HB1036 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Notification that HB1036 is now Act 188
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Reduce The Costs Of Concealed Carry Licensure And Firearm Ownership.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Reduce The Costs Of Concealed Carry Licensure And Firearm Ownership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 74 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20HouseNotification that HB1036 is now Act 188
2019-02-19HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-02-18HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-02-18HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-02-18SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-02-18SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-02-14SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-01-28SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-01-28SenateReceived from the House.
2019-01-28HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-01-24HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-01-16HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-01-16HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-01-16HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-01-14HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2018-12-17HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback