AR HB1031 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - Notification that HB1031 is now Act 127
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - Notification that HB1031 is now Act 127
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Arkansas Highway Revenue Distribution Law Concerning Distributions To County Aid Funds And Municipal Aid Funds.
Title
To Amend The Arkansas Highway Revenue Distribution Law Concerning Distributions To County Aid Funds And Municipal Aid Funds.
Sponsors
Rep. Lanny Fite [R] | Sen. Kim Hammer [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-24 | House | Notification that HB1031 is now Act 127 |
2023-02-21 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2023-02-21 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2023-02-21 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-02-09 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-02-08 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-01-31 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-01-31 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-01-31 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-01-09 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2022-12-13 | House | Filed |