AR HB1030 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Re-referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
Pending: House Aging, Children and Youth, Legislative and Military Affairs Committee
Hearing: Mar 20 @ 9:00 am in Room 130
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Establish Arkansas Music Appreciation Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Establish Arkansas Music Appreciation Day.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseRe-referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-03-07HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-03-07SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2019-03-07SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-06SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-06SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-05SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
2019-02-11SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-02-11SenateReceived from the House.
2019-02-11HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-02-06HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-01-14HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2018-12-06HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback