AR HB1028 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-30 - Notification that HB1028 is now Act 21
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-30 - Notification that HB1028 is now Act 21
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Replace The Term "child Pornography" With The Term "child Sexual Abuse Material" In The Arkansas Code.
Title
To Replace The Term "child Pornography" With The Term "child Sexual Abuse Material" In The Arkansas Code.
Sponsors
Rep. Charlene Fite [R] | Sen. Jim Petty [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | House | Notification that HB1028 is now Act 21 |
2023-01-26 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2023-01-26 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2023-01-26 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-01-19 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-01-18 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-01-09 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2022-12-06 | House | Filed |