AR HB1026 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-21 - Notification that HB1026 is now Act 96
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Prohibit Local Governments From Enacting An Income Tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Prohibit Local Governments From Enacting An Income Tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-09 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 10 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-21HouseNotification that HB1026 is now Act 96
2023-02-16HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2023-02-15HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2023-02-15HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2023-02-14HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
2023-02-09HouseRe-referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2023-02-09HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2023-02-09SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2023-02-09SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-02-08SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2023-02-06SenateRe-referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
2023-02-06SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-02-06SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2023-02-06SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2023-02-06SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2023-02-01SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
2023-02-01SenateReceived from the House.
2023-01-31HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-01-30HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-01-30HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-01-30HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-01-26HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2023-01-09HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2022-12-05HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?id=hb1026&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1026.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1026%2FHB1026013020230942.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1026%2FHB1026020620230956.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2023R%2FPublic%2F&file=96.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1026-H1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1026-S1.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAssembly%2F2023%2F2023R%2FFiscal+Impacts%2FHB1026-DFA1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1026&rcs=107&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1026&rcs=155&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R

Bill Comments

feedback