AR HB1025 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-27 - Notification that HB1025 is now Act 46
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Prescription Drug Monitoring Program Act To Allow Access To The Arkansas Medicaid Prescription Drug Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Prescription Drug Monitoring Program Act To Allow Access To The Arkansas Medicaid Prescription Drug Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-27HouseNotification that HB1025 is now Act 46
2017-01-26HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2017-01-26HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2017-01-26HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2017-01-26SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2017-01-26SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-01-25SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2017-01-23SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
2017-01-23SenateReceived from the House.
2017-01-23HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2017-01-20HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-01-20HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2017-01-20HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2017-01-19HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
2017-01-11HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-01-11HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2017-01-11HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2017-01-09HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2016-11-28HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback