AR HB1024 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-31 - Notification that HB1024 is now Act 72
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Modify The Definition Of "chronic Nonmalignant Pain" In The Combating Prescription Drug Abuse Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Modify The Definition Of "chronic Nonmalignant Pain" In The Combating Prescription Drug Abuse Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-31HouseNotification that HB1024 is now Act 72
2017-01-26HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2017-01-26HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2017-01-26HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2017-01-26SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2017-01-26SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-01-25SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2017-01-23SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
2017-01-23SenateReceived from the House.
2017-01-23HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2017-01-19HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2017-01-09HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2016-11-28HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback