AR HB1023 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-20 - Notification that HB1023 is now Act 3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

The General Appropriation Act For The 2015-2016 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The General Appropriation Act For The 2015-2016 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-01-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-15 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-01-20HouseNotification that HB1023 is now Act 3
2015-01-20HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2015-01-20HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2015-01-20SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2015-01-20SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2015-01-20SenateRead the third time and passed.
2015-01-20SenateRules suspended.
2015-01-20SenateThe vote by which the emergency clause was adopted on January 15 was expunged.
2015-01-20SenateThe vote by which HB 1023 passed on January 15 was expunged.
2015-01-15SenateHB 1023 was returned from the House as requested
2015-01-15HouseReturned to the Senate as requested.
2015-01-15SenateThe Senate recalled HB1023 from the House
2015-01-15HouseReturned from the Governor's Office as requested.
2015-01-15HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2015-01-15HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2015-01-15HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2015-01-15SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2015-01-15SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2015-01-15SenateRead the third time and passed.
2015-01-15SenateRules suspended.
2015-01-15SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2015-01-15SenateReceived from the House.
2015-01-14HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2015-01-14HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2015-01-13HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2015-01-12HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2015-01-06HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback