AR HB1020 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Notification that HB1020 is now Act 795
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Uniform Limited Liability Company Act; And To Revise Charging Orders Under The Uniform Limited Liability Company Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Uniform Limited Liability Company Act; And To Revise Charging Orders Under The Uniform Limited Liability Company Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-06 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - Third Reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-13HouseNotification that HB1020 is now Act 795
2023-04-07HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2023-04-06HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2023-04-06HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2023-04-06HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
2023-04-05HouseRe-referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2023-04-05HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2023-04-05SenateReturned to the House as passed, as amended # 1
2023-04-05SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-04-04SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-04-04SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2023-04-04SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2023-03-31SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2023-03-06SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2023-03-06SenateReceived from the House.
2023-03-06HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-03-01HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2023-02-09HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-02-09HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-02-09HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-01-09HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2022-12-05HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?id=hb1020&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1020.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1020%2FHB1020020920230921.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1020%2FHB1020040420231325.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2023R%2FPublic%2F&file=795.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1020-H1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1020-S1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1020&rcs=410&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1020&rcs=932&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1020&rcs=1141&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R

Bill Comments

feedback