AR HB1019 | 2016 | 90th General Assembly Fiscal

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Notification that HB1019 is now Act 195
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Department Of Finance And Administration - Division Of Racing Appropriation For The 2016-2017 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Department Of Finance And Administration - Division Of Racing Appropriation For The 2016-2017 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04HouseNotification that HB1019 is now Act 195
2016-04-28HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2016-04-28HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2016-04-28HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2016-04-28SenateReturned to the House as Passed.
2016-04-28SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2016-04-28SenateRead the third time and passed.
2016-04-27SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2016-04-27SenateReceived from the House.
2016-04-27HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2016-04-27HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2016-04-27HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2016-04-27HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2016-04-26HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2016-04-21HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2016-04-21HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2016-04-21HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2016-04-13HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2016-03-18HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback