AR HB1017 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-30 - Notification that HB1017 is now Act 20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-30 - Notification that HB1017 is now Act 20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Allowing Certain Employees To Take A Leave Of Absence For Emergency And Rescue Services.
Title
To Amend The Law Allowing Certain Employees To Take A Leave Of Absence For Emergency And Rescue Services.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Berry [R] | Rep. Jill Bryant [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | House | Notification that HB1017 is now Act 20 |
2023-01-26 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2023-01-26 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2023-01-26 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-01-23 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-01-19 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-01-09 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2022-12-05 | House | Filed |