AR HB1015 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-01-21 - REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning The Damage To Or Destruction Of A Public Monument Or Object Of Public Respect; And Concerning Public Monuments And Objects Of Public Respect On The Grounds Of The State Capitol.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning The Damage To Or Destruction Of A Public Monument Or Object Of Public Respect; And Concerning Public Monuments And Objects Of Public Respect On The Grounds Of The State Capitol.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-21HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-01-21HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-01-21HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-01-13HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-01-13HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-01-13HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-01-11HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2020-12-02HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback