AR HB1014 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-9)
Status: Passed on February 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-06 - Notification that HB1014 is now Act 23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Exempt State Institutions, Political Subdivisions, And Any Other Applicable Entity With Tort Liability Immunity From The Requirement To Obtain General Liability Insurance Coverage When Obtaining A Child Care Facility License.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Exempt State Institutions, Political Subdivisions, And Any Other Applicable Entity With Tort Liability Immunity From The Requirement To Obtain General Liability Insurance Coverage When Obtaining A Child Care Facility License.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-05 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-06HouseNotification that HB1014 is now Act 23
2015-02-05HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2015-02-05HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2015-02-05HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2015-02-05SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2015-02-05SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2015-02-05SenateRead the third time and passed.
2015-02-04SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2015-01-20SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
2015-01-20SenateReceived from the House.
2015-01-20HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2015-01-20HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2015-01-15HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2015-01-12HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2014-12-22HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback