AR HB1013 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on February 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-26 - Notification that HB1013 is now Act 165
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on February 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-26 - Notification that HB1013 is now Act 165
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Summary
To Change The Location, Use, And Capacity Of The Department Of Veterans' Affairs Veterans' Home
Title
To Change The Location, Use, And Capacity Of The Department Of Veterans' Affairs Veterans' Home
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-22 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - The vote by which HB1013 Passed was expunged. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - The vote by which HB1013 Passed was expunged. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | House | Notification that HB1013 is now Act 165 |
2013-02-22 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-02-22 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-02-22 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2013-02-20 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2013-02-19 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-02-19 | House | The vote by which HB1013 Passed was expunged. |
2013-02-19 | House | EXPUNGED |
2013-02-18 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-02-13 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-02-07 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-02-07 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-01-29 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-01-28 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-01-28 | House | Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-01-28 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-01-24 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-01-24 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-01-24 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-01-23 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 |
2013-01-16 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-01-16 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-01-16 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-01-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2012-12-05 | House | Filed |