AR HB1012 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Notification that HB1012 is now Act 167
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Notification that HB1012 is now Act 167
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Authorize The Issuance Of A Purple Heart Recipient Special License Plate To A Surviving Spouse.
Title
To Authorize The Issuance Of A Purple Heart Recipient Special License Plate To A Surviving Spouse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-18 | House | Notification that HB1012 is now Act 167 |
2019-02-14 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-02-14 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-02-14 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2019-02-13 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-01-31 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-01-29 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-01-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2018-12-03 | House | Filed |