AR HB1011 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To License Naturopathic Practitioners.
Title
An Act To License Naturopathic Practitioners.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | House | Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-21 | House | WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR |
2013-03-20 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-20 | House | Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-02-28 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-02-28 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-02-22 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-02-22 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-02-22 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-01-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2012-12-04 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB1011 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/HB1011.pdf |