AR HB1010 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 21 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning The Filing And Publication Of Certain Campaign Finance Reports; And To Amend Portions Of Law Resulting From Initiated Act 1 Of 1990 And Initiated Act 1 Of 1996.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning The Filing And Publication Of Certain Campaign Finance Reports; And To Amend Portions Of Law Resulting From Initiated Act 1 Of 1990 And Initiated Act 1 Of 1996.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-20 - House of Representatives - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House of Representatives - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-21HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2017-03-20HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2017-03-20HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2017-03-15HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
2017-03-09HouseRe-referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2017-03-09HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2017-03-09SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2017-03-09SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-03-08SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-03-08SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2017-03-07SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2017-02-27SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
2017-02-27SenateReceived from the House.
2017-02-27HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2017-02-24HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2017-02-22HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-02-22HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2017-02-22HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2017-02-15HouseRe-referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2017-02-15HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2017-02-15HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2017-01-11HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-01-11HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2017-01-11HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2017-01-09HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2016-11-18HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback