AR HB1006 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Create The Parent-child Intrastate Relocation Act.
Title
To Create The Parent-child Intrastate Relocation Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Lowery [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 44 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | House | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment |
2021-03-17 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2021-03-16 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-16 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-16 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-15 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Re-referred to reassign to transfer to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2021-01-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2020-11-20 | House | Filed |