AR HB1004 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-09 - Notification that HB1004 is now Act 37
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Sex Offender Registration Act Of 1997 To Include Disclosure Of A Sex Offender's Address To The Public; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Sex Offender Registration Act Of 1997 To Include Disclosure Of A Sex Offender's Address To The Public; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - Third Reading (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-09HouseNotification that HB1004 is now Act 37
2023-02-07HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2023-02-07HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2023-02-07SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2023-02-07SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2023-02-07SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-02-06SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2023-02-01SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2023-02-01SenateReceived from the House.
2023-02-01HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2023-02-01HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-01-31HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2023-01-30HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-01-30HouseAmendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-01-30HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-01-23HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-01-23HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-01-23HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-01-10HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-01-10HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-01-10HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-01-09HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2022-11-17HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?id=hb1004&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1004.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1004%2FHB1004011020230953.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1004%2FHB1004012320231004.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1004%2FHB1004012320231037.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1004%2FHB1004013020230934.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2023R%2FPublic%2F&file=37.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1004-H1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1004-H2.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1004-H3.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1004&rcs=118&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1004&rcs=135&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R

Bill Comments

feedback