AR HB1004 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly 1st Special

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Notification that HB1004 is now Act 4
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning The Arkansas Health Insurance Marketplace; To Study The Future Direction Of The Arkansas Health Insurance Marketplace; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning The Arkansas Health Insurance Marketplace; To Study The Future Direction Of The Arkansas Health Insurance Marketplace; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-03 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 79 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-04HouseNotification that HB1004 is now Act 4
2017-05-03HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2017-05-03HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2017-05-03HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2017-05-03SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2017-05-03SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2017-05-03SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-05-02SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2017-05-02SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce
2017-05-02SenateReceived from the House.
2017-05-02HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2017-05-02HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2017-05-01HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2017-05-01HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2017-05-01HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback