AR HB1004 | 2016 | 90th General Assembly 3rd Special

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Notification that HB1004 is now Act 10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning The Qualifications Of Professionals Under The Private Security Agency, Private Investigator, And School Security Licensing And Credentialing Act; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning The Qualifications Of Professionals Under The Private Security Agency, Private Investigator, And School Security Licensing And Credentialing Act; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-23HouseNotification that HB1004 is now Act 10
2016-05-23HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2016-05-23HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2016-05-23HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2016-05-23SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2016-05-23SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2016-05-23SenateRead the third time and passed.
2016-05-20SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2016-05-20SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
2016-05-20SenateReceived from the House.
2016-05-20HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2016-05-20HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2016-05-20HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2016-05-20HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2016-05-20HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2016-05-19HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2016-05-19HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2016-05-18HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback