AR HB1003 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly 1st Special
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Notification that HB1003 is now Act 3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Notification that HB1003 is now Act 3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Arkansas Works To Reduce Income Eligibility Limits And Impose Work Requirements; To Allow The Flexibility To Select Whether To Become An "assessment State" Or A "determination State"; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend Arkansas Works To Reduce Income Eligibility Limits And Impose Work Requirements; To Allow The Flexibility To Select Whether To Become An "assessment State" Or A "determination State"; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Notification that HB1003 is now Act 3 |
2017-05-03 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-05-03 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-05-03 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-05-03 | Senate | The vote by which the Emergency Clause failed was expunged |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Emergency Clause failed of adoption |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-05-02 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-05-02 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-05-01 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-05-01 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-05-01 | House | Filed |