AR HB1003 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
The Arkansas Nighttime Environment Protection Act.
Title
The Arkansas Nighttime Environment Protection Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | House | Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-03-19 | House | WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR |
2015-03-09 | House | Reassigned and transfer to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE |
2015-03-06 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-06 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-06 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-02-18 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-02-18 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-02-18 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-01-12 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2014-11-18 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB1003 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Bills/HB1003.pdf |