AR HB1002 | 2022 | 93rd General Assembly (Special)

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 75-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-11 - Notification that HB1002 is now Act 1
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Reduce Arkansas Income Taxes; To Adopt Federal Law On Depreciation And Expensing Of Property; To Create An Income-tax Credit For Certain Taxpayers; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Reduce Arkansas Income Taxes; To Adopt Federal Law On Depreciation And Expensing Of Property; To Create An Income-tax Credit For Certain Taxpayers; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors

Rep. Logan Jett [R]Sen. Jonathan Dismang [R]Rep. Matthew Shepherd [R]Rep. Lane Jean [R]
Rep. Marcus Richmond [R]Rep. Mark Berry [R]Rep. Justin Boyd [R]Rep. Joshua Bryant [R]
Rep. Joe Cloud [R]Rep. Delia Haak [R]Rep. Johnny Rye [R]Rep. Brandt Smith [R]
Rep. Brian Evans [R]Rep. Michelle Gray [R]Rep. Deann Vaught [R]Rep. Les Warren [R]
Rep. David Ray [R]Rep. Jim Wooten [R]Rep. Jon Milligan [R]Rep. Bruce Cozart [R]
Rep. Cindy Crawford [R]Rep. Les Eaves [R]Rep. David Hillman [R]Rep. Cameron Cooper [R]
Rep. Karilyn Brown [R]Rep. Kenneth Bragg [R]Rep. Lanny Fite [R]Rep. Rick McClure [R]
Rep. Jim Dotson [R]Rep. Carlton Wing [R]Rep. Bruce Coleman [R]Rep. Aaron Pilkington [R]
Rep. Steve Hollowell [R]Rep. John Maddox [R]Rep. Keith Slape [R]Rep. Robin Lundstrum [R]
Rep. Keith Brooks [R]Rep. Kendon Underwood [R]Rep. Richard McGrew [R]Rep. Howard Beaty [R]
Rep. Mary Bentley [R]Rep. Nelda Speaks [R]Rep. Mark Lowery [R]Rep. Roger Lynch [R]
Rep. Carol Dalby [R]Rep. Danny Watson [R]Rep. Stu Smith [R]Rep. Harlan Breaux [R]
Rep. John Payton [R]Rep. Julie Mayberry [R]Rep. Stan Berry [R]Rep. Austin Mccollum [R]
Rep. Dwight Tosh [R]Sen. Charles Beckham [R]Sen. Cecile Bledsoe [R]Sen. Ronald Caldwell [R]
Sen. Jane English [R]Sen. Scott Flippo [R]Sen. Colby Fulfer [R]Sen. Ben Gilmore [R]
Sen. Blake Johnson [R]Sen. Mark Johnson [R]Sen. Kim Hammer [R]Sen. Bart Hester [R]
Sen. Jimmy Hickey [R]Sen. Ricky Hill [R]Sen. Missy Irvin [R]Sen. Matthew Pitsch [R]
Sen. Jason Rapert [R]Sen. Terry Rice [R]Sen. Bill Sample [R]Sen. Gary Stubblefield [R]
Sen. James Sturch [R]Sen. Dan Sullivan [R]Sen. David Wallace [R]

Roll Calls

2022-08-11 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-10 - House - Third Reading (Y: 81 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-08-11HouseNotification that HB1002 is now Act 1
2022-08-11HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2022-08-11HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2022-08-11HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2022-08-11SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2022-08-11SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2022-08-11SenateRead the third time and passed.
2022-08-10SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2022-08-10SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
2022-08-10SenateReceived from the House.
2022-08-10HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2022-08-10HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2022-08-09HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2022-08-09HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2022-08-08HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback