AL SJR93 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Delivered to Governor at 10:20 a.m. on March 11, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Delivered to Governor at 10:20 a.m. on March 11, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Hoover High School girls basketball team, commended
Title
Hoover High School girls basketball team, commended
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor at 10:20 a.m. on March 11, 2010 | |
2010-03-11 | Assigned Act No. 2010-205. | |
2010-03-11 | Enrolled | |
2010-03-11 | Signature Requested | |
2010-03-09 | Passed Second House | |
2010-03-09 | Guin motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-03-09 | Reported from Rules | |
2010-03-04 | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules | |
2010-03-04 | Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced |