AL SJR84 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Forwarded to Governor on May 8, 2012 at 3:49 p.m. on May 8, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Forwarded to Governor on May 8, 2012 at 3:49 p.m. on May 8, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Naming the new student center at Wallace Community College the "Dr. James M. Mitchell Student Center", and various streets named
Title
Naming the new student center at Wallace Community College the "Dr. James M. Mitchell Student Center", and various streets named
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Forwarded to Governor on May 8, 2012 at 3:49 p.m. on May 8, 2012 | |
2012-05-08 | Assigned Act No. 2012-341. | |
2012-05-08 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-08 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-08 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-08 | Galliher motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-05-08 | Reported from Rules | |
2012-05-03 | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules | |
2012-05-02 | Sanders motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-05-02 | Introduced |