AL SJR67 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Assigned Act No. 2018-350.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Sergeant William Wayne Seay Memorial Highway, portion of Highway 31 in Escambia County, named

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sergeant William Wayne Seay Memorial Highway, portion of Highway 31 in Escambia County, named

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - Baker motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15SenateAssigned Act No. 2018-350.
2018-03-15SenateEnrolled
2018-03-15HouseSignature Requested
2018-03-15SenateSecond House Concurs in Executive Amendment
2018-03-15HouseBaker motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 800
2018-03-15HouseHouse of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment
2018-03-13SenateAlbritton motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-13SenateExecutive Amendment Offered
2018-03-13SenateForwarded to Governor
2018-03-06SenateEnrolled
2018-03-06HouseSignature Requested
2018-03-06SenatePassed Second House
2018-03-01HouseJones motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-01HouseReported from Rules as Favorable
2018-02-22HouseReceived in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules
2018-02-22SenateWaggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2018-02-22SenateReported from Rules
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced and referred to the Senate committee on Rules

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback