AL SJR4 | 2015 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-16 - Assigned Act No. 2015-558.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Keller, Helen, endorsing the choice of Helen Keller's image on ten dollar bill

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Keller, Helen, endorsing the choice of Helen Keller's image on ten dollar bill

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-09-16SenateAssigned Act No. 2015-558.
2015-09-16SenateEnrolled
2015-09-16HouseSignature Requested
2015-09-16SenatePassed Second House
2015-09-15HouseJohnson (R) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2015-09-15HouseReported from Rules
2015-09-14HouseReceived in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules
2015-09-14SenateWaggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2015-09-14SenateReported from Rules
2015-09-10SenateIntroduced and referred to the Senate committee on Rules

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback