AL SJR3 | 2011 | Organizational Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-12-1)
Status: Passed on January 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-18 - Delivered to Governor at 10:18 a.m. on January 18, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Auburn University football team, commended

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Auburn University football team, commended

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-01-18 Delivered to Governor at 10:18 a.m. on January 18, 2011
2011-01-18 Assigned Act No. 2011-2.
2011-01-18 Enrolled
2011-01-18 Signature Requested
2011-01-12 Passed Second House
2011-01-11 Gaston motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2011-01-11 Received in House of Representatives
2011-01-11 Whatley motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2011-01-11 Introduced

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback