AL SJR25 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 25 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-25 - Delivered to Governor at 11:39 a.m. on 1/25/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 25 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-25 - Delivered to Governor at 11:39 a.m. on 1/25/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law enforcement officers, recognized
Title
Law enforcement officers, recognized
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor at 11:39 a.m. on 1/25/18 |
2018-01-25 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2018-01-23 | House | Jones motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2018-01-23 | House | Reported from Rules and received |
2018-01-18 | House | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Stutts motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Introduced |